MA S268 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4289
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to interrupt the school to prison pipeline. Education.
Title
Interrupting the school to prison pipeline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4289 |
2013-08-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4289 (Replaced by) 2014-07-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S268 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S268.pdf |