MA S2660 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S606
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote continuity of care for multiple sclerosis treatment, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2660).
Title
Promoting continuity of care for Multiple Sclerosis treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-04-27 | Senate | New draft of S606 |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S606 (Replaces) 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2660 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2660.pdf |