MA S265 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2619
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to rates of payment for early childhood education and care programs. Education.
Title
Relative to quality funding for early childhood education and care programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2619 |
2023-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2619 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - New draft substituted, see S2697
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S265 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S265.pdf |