MA S2637 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1130
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the effective enforcement of municipal ordinances and bylaws (Senate, No. 1130),-- reports, that the matter be placed on the orders of the Day for the next session, with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2637).
Title
Relative to the effective enforcement of municipal ordinances and bylaws
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-31 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft of S1130 |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1130 |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1130 (Replaces) 2018-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2637
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1256 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S161 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1256 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S161 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2637 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2637.pdf |