MA S2615 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to host community agreements (House, No. 4398), - reported, in part, a "Bill ensuring access to qualified health professionals" (Senate, No. 2615).
Title
Ensuring access to qualified health professionals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Reported on a part of H4398 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2615 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2615.pdf |