MA S261 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to enable the Massachusetts Center for Employee Ownership. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enabling the Massachusetts Center for Employee Ownership

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-03SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2021-09-28JointHearing scheduled for 10/05/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H2021 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
H511 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback