MA S2606 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, July 16, 2018 - The committee on Ways and Means to whom was referred the Senate Bill to establish a registry of caretakers found to have substantiated abuse against persons with intellectual disability or developmental disability (Senate, No. 2213),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2606).
Title
To establish a registry of caretakers found to have substantiated abuse against persons with intellectual disability or developmental disability
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-19 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #454 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S2213 |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Tarr) rejected |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Moore) adopted |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2213 |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H852 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S64 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
S770 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H80 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4026
S55 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S64 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
S770 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H80 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4026
S55 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2606 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2606.pdf |