MA S258 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote social-emotional learning. Education.
Title
To promote social-emotional learning
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H402 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H430 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H430 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S258 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S258.pdf |