MA S2560 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2563
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing senatorial districts
Title
Establishing senatorial districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #98 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reprinted, as amended, see S2563 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Read third |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Brownsberger) adopted |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Read second |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Read and placed in Orders of the Day for Wednesday, October 27, 2021 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Reported from the Special Joint Committee on Redistricting |
Same As/Similar To
S2563 (Replaced by) 2021-11-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2560 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2560.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall98.pdf |