MA S2557 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2754
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - New draft (Tran) substituted, see S2754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - New draft (Tran) substituted, see S2754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter for the town of Lunenburg. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Revising the town charter of Lunenburg
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Tran [R] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | New draft (Tran) substituted, see S2754 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Read second |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-02-26 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2754 (Replaced by) 2020-08-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2557 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2557.pdf |