MA S2557 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1712
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act further regulating debt collection
Title
Further regulating debt collection
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-30 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-12-30 | Enacted | |
2010-12-30 | House concurred in the Senate amendment | |
2010-12-30 | Rules suspended | |
2010-10-12 | Amendment adopted | |
2010-10-12 | Rules suspended | |
2010-10-05 | Enacted | |
2010-10-04 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-31 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-31 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-31 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for for the next sitting | |
2010-07-29 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2010-07-21 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2010-07-20 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-20 | Substituted for S1712 | |
2010-07-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-20 | New draft of S1712 | |
2010-07-20 | Reported from the committee on Senate Committee on Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1712 (Replaces) 2010-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2557
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s02557.htm |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S2557 |