MA S253 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2349
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish funds to provide for increases in English language learners in school districts. Education.
Title
Establishing funds to provide for increases in English language learners in school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2349 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3482 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2012 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H3557 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H3934 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2349 (Replaced by) 2018-04-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2012 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H3557 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H3934 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2349 (Replaced by) 2018-04-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S253 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S253.pdf |