MA S2502 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S969
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create an updated Parental Surrogacy Act,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2502).
Title
To promote family stability
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-30 | Senate | New draft of S969 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S969 (Replaces) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2502
S248 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S1195 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied H1163
S519 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1511 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3853
S248 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S1195 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied H1163
S519 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1511 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3853
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2502 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2502.pdf |