MA S2465 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S456
Note: Legislation replaced by S2595
Note: Legislation replaced by S2595
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure safe drinking water at schools and early childhood programs; and of Lori A. Ehrlich, Joan B. Lovely and others relative to drinking water at schools and early childhood programs,- reports the accompanying resolve (Senate, No. 2465).
Title
Resolve creating a commission on remediating lead in drinking water of schools and early childhood centers
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2595 |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Read second |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2595 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-04-23 | Senate | New draft of S456 and H2915 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S456 (Replaces) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2465
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H259 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S2595 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H259 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S2595 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2465 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2465.pdf |