MA S246 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to empower students and schools to thrive. Education.
Title
Empowering students and schools to thrive
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 02:00 PM-08:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1929 (Similar To) 2023-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
S1956 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S293 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H2076 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2857 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
S1956 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S293 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H2076 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2857 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S246 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S246.pdf |