MA S2453 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2772
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to establishing and implementing a Food and Health Pilot Program. Public Health.
Title
Relative to establishing and implementing a Food and Health Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2772 |
2020-02-10 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2020-01-02 | House | House concurred |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2772 (Replaced by) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2453 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2453.pdf |