MA S2450 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to principle-based reserving for life insurance,-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2450).
Title
Relative to principle-based reserving for life insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-12-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-12-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Substituted for S539 |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S539 |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2470 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S539 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2450
H20 (Similar To) 2015-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H965 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H3198 (Similar To) 2015-12-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2015
H4505 (Similar To) 2016-07-17 - Placed on file
S539 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2450
H20 (Similar To) 2015-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H965 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H3198 (Similar To) 2015-12-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2015
H4505 (Similar To) 2016-07-17 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2450.pdf |