MA S2438 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter for the town of Nantucket. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter for the town of Nantucket
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-10-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-08-14 | House | House concurred |
2023-08-10 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2438 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2438.pdf |