MA S2419 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to manufactured housing communities (Senate, No. 715),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2419).
Title
Relative to manufactured housing communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S715 |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S715 |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S15 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2015
S16 (Similar To) 2015-03-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2015
S21 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - See H65
S36 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - See H3203
S39 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2015
S2513 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2515 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S16 (Similar To) 2015-03-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2015
S21 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - See H65
S36 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - See H3203
S39 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2015
S2513 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2515 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2419 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2419.pdf |