MA S2412 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 465 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 465 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Falmouth to expend borrowed funds to offset certain costs. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Falmouth to expend borrowed funds to offset certain costs associated with the installation of low pressure pumps on private property in the little pond sewer service area
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 465 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-12-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-12-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-12-24 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2014-12-15 | House | House concurred |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2412 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2412.pdf |