MA S2402 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 493 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 493 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to certificates of insurance (Senate, No. 2077),- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft of the same title (Senate, No. 2402).
Title
Relative to certificates of insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 493 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-06 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-12-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-12-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-12-08 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-12-01 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-11-26 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-11-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-11-26 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S2077 |
2014-11-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-11-26 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2077 |
2014-11-26 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2402 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2402.pdf |