MA S2394 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S448
Note: Legislation replaced by S2617
Note: Legislation replaced by S2617
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2617
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2617
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to further regulate the discharge of pollutants into waters,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2394).
Title
Promoting awareness of sewage pollution in public waters
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-26 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2617 |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Read second |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Placed the in Orders of the Day for the nest session |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2617 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-05 | Senate | New draft of S448 and H2935 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S448 (Replaces) 2018-04-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2394
H2138 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H2942 (Similar To) 2017-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4042
S2617 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2138 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H2942 (Similar To) 2017-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4042
S2617 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2394 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2394.pdf |