MA S2393 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey certain parcels of land to the city of Westfield. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey certain parcels of land to the city of Westfield
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-01 | House | House concurred |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H4447 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4523 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4523 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2393 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2393.pdf |