MA S2375 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2631
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate March 22, 2018, – Text of the Senate Bill to promote and enhance civic engagement (being the text of Senate document number 2355, printed as amended)
Title
To promote and enhance civic engagement
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 365 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2631 |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Accompanied S2631 |
2018-06-11 | House | Committee of conference appointed - (Peisch-Tucker-Crocker), in concurrence |
2018-06-11 | House | House insisted on its amendment |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Chang-Diaz - Friedman - Tran) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the House amendment |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules susepnded |
2018-05-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 365) |
2018-05-30 | House | Amendment 13 adopted, as changed |
2018-05-30 | House | Amendment 12 adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | Amendment 9 rejected |
2018-05-30 | House | Amendment 7 rejected |
2018-05-30 | House | Read third |
2018-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-30 | House | Read second, amended by substitution of a new text (H4545) and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H4545) pending |
2018-05-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment (H4545) and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-05-29 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-23 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2018-03-26 | House | Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #343 (Yeas 32 to nays 4) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Text of S2355, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S2631 (Replaced by) 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 296 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2375 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2375.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov//Journal/House/190/RollCalls/hj05302018_RollCalls.pdf |