MA S2374 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2408
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - New draft substituted, see S2408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - New draft substituted, see S2408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Glenwood Cemetery Perpetual Care Fund. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Glenwood Cemetery Perpetual Care Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2408 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Read second |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-10-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-10-06 | House | House concurred |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2408 (Replaced by) 2015-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2374 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2374.pdf |