MA S2373 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2415
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the practice and licensure of lactation consultants. Public Health.
Title
Regulating the practice and licensure of lactation consultants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2415 |
2012-08-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/13/2012 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2012-07-23 | House | House concurred |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2415 (Replaced by) 2012-08-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2373 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17994&generalCourtId=1 |