MA S2371 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S328
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 446 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 446 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate bill to protect public water supply lands (Senate, No. 328); report recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2371).
Title
To protect public water supply lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 446 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-31 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-12-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-12-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders |
2012-12-17 | House | House CHouse oHouse mHouse mHouse iHouse tHouse tHouse eHouse eHouse House rHouse eHouse cHouse oHouse mHouse mHouse eHouse nHouse dHouse eHouse dHouse House oHouse uHouse gHouse hHouse tHouse House tHouse oHouse House pHouse aHouse sHouse sHouse House aHouse nHouse dHouse House rHouse eHouse fHouse eHouse rHouse rHouse eHouse dHouse House tHouse oHouse House tHouse hHouse eHouse |
2012-07-25 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S328 |
2012-07-23 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S328 |
2012-07-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S328 (Replaces) 2012-07-24 - Pending new draft substituted, see S2371
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2371 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119495&generalCourtId=1 |