MA S2370 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S327
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to water conservation (Senate, No. 327); report recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2370).
Title
Relative to water conservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-25 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Substituted, as amended as a new draft for S327 |
2012-07-23 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S327 |
2012-07-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S327 (Replaces) 2012-07-24 - Pending new draft substituted, see S2370
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2370 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119497&generalCourtId=1 |