MA S237 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2255
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to support healthy development among preschoolers. Education.
Title
To support healthy development among preschoolers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2255 |
2017-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2010 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4131
H4131 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2255 (Replaced by) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4131 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2255 (Replaced by) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S237 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S237.pdf |