MA S2367 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-30 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-30 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land in New Bedford to the city of New Bedford. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land in New Bedford to the city of New Bedford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #287 [37 YEAS - 0 NAYS] |
2012-07-30 | House | Enacted - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 347) |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-07-30 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-07-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-07-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-26 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2012-07-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2012 from 11:30 AM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2012-07-25 | House | House concurred |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-23 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2367 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119491&generalCourtId=1 |