MA S2347 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2646
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-31 - Accompanied S2646
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-31 - Accompanied S2646
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate March 15, 2018, – Text of the Senate Bill to protect animal welfare and safety in cities and towns (being the text of Senate document number 2332, printed as amended)
Title
To protect animal welfare and safety in cities and towns
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-31 - House - House On Acceptance of the conference report Yea and Nay No. 517 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Acceptance of the conference report Yea and Nay No. 517 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 369 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Acceptance of the conference report Yea and Nay No. 517 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 369 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | Accompanied S2646 |
2018-07-26 | House | Committee on conference membership change (Peake-O'Day-Muradian, in concurrence) |
2018-07-17 | House | Committee of conference appointed - (Kafka-O'Day-Muradian), in concurrence |
2018-07-17 | House | House insisted on its amendment |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Montigny-Hinds-Tarr) |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the House amendment |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-06-06 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 147 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 369) |
2018-06-06 | House | Amendment 11 adopted |
2018-06-06 | House | Amendment 8 rejected |
2018-06-06 | House | Amendment 3 rejected |
2018-06-06 | House | Amendment 2 rejected |
2018-06-06 | House | Read third |
2018-06-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-06-06 | House | Read second, amended by substitution of a new text (H4565) and ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H4565) pending |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment (H4565) and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-03-21 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #337 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Text of S2332, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S2646 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 219 of the Acts of 2018