MA S2344 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2297
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the adjustment of disability retirement benefits to Lynn police officer Gregory LeBlanc reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2344).
Title
Relative to the adjustment of disability retirement benefits to Lynn police officer Gregory LeBlanc
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-09-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-09-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-09-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-09-24 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-07-16 | Senate | New draft of S2297 |
2012-07-16 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2297 (Replaces) 2012-07-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2344
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2344 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119414&generalCourtId=1 |