MA S2341 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-21 - Bill substituted for report and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-21 - Bill substituted for report and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Tina L. Sarty, an employee of the Department of Transitional Assistance. Senate Ways and Means .
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Tina L. Sarty, an employee of the Department of Transitional Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-21 | Senate | Bill substituted for report and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-07-11 | House | House concurred |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2341 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118876&generalCourtId=1 |