MA S2320 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Groveland to provide for the construction and maintenance of a solar generating facility on land held for water supply purposes
Title
Authorizing the town of Groveland to provide for the construction and maintenance of a solar generating facility on land held for water supply purposes
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #272 [35 YEAS to 0 NAYS] |
2012-07-26 | House | Enacted - 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 329) |
2012-07-25 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-06-25 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S2257 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Tarr) for S2257 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2320 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119221&generalCourtId=1 |