MA S2313 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2205
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to access to a decedent's electronic mail accounts
Title
Relative to access to a decedent's electronic mail accounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-07-18 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-28 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Substituted, as amended for S2205 |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-06-21 | Senate | New draft of S2205 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2205 (Replaces) 2012-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2313
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2313 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119003&generalCourtId=1 |