MA S2310 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1314
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the closure of state police barracks,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2310).
Title
Regulating the closure of state police barracks
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-05 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S1314 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tarr) adopted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S1314 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1314 (Replaces) 2018-03-02 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2310 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2310.pdf |