MA S2306 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2252
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-08 - Pocket vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-08 - Pocket vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act regulating notaries public to protect consumers and the validity and effectiveness of recorded instruments The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill regulating notaries public to protect consumers and the validity and effectiveness of recorded instruments (Senate, No. 2252),- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2306).
Title
Regulating notaries public to protect consumers and the validity and effectiveness of recorded instruments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-08 | Pocket vetoed | |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-31 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-12-24 | House | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted |
2014-12-24 | House | Read second |
2014-12-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-12-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2014-12-24 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-07-28 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #421 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Read third |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, as a new draft for S2252 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Amendment (Creem) adopted |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S2252 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2252 (Replaces) 2014-07-24 - New draft substituted, see S2306
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2306 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2306.pdf |