MA S2300 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1018
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the effective enforcement of municipal ordinances and bylaws
Title
Relative to the effective enforcement of municipal ordinances and bylaws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-06-13 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Substituted for S1018 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S1018 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1018 (Replaces) 2012-06-12 - New draft substituted, see S2300
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2300 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118833&generalCourtId=1 |