MA S2296 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S591
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect access to confidential healthcare
Title
To protect access to confidential healthcare
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Senate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment Roll Call #329 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 313 (Y: 139 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 313 (Y: 139 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-03-22 | House | Enacted |
2018-03-21 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-03-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment -see Roll Call #329 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 139 YEAS to 14 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 313) |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment 5 rejected |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment 4 adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-28 | House | Read second, amended by substitution of a new text (H4256) and ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H4256) pending |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-02-15 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Spilka) adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tarr) adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Substituted for S591 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S591 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S591 (Replaces) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see S2296