MA S2292 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the assignment of a perpetual conservation restriction in the town of Middleborough
Title
Providing for the assignment of a perpetual conservation restriction in the town of Middleborough
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 86 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #90 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #90 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #90 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2019-07-31 | House | Enacted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 86) |
2019-07-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-07-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-07-19 | House | Read and; referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Substituted for S1198 |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Pacheco) for S1198 |
Same As/Similar To
S2239 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2303
H2522 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S1198 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2292
S2303 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2019
H2522 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S1198 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2292
S2303 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2019