MA S2287 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to preserve the Schooner Ernestina-Morrissey. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To preserve the Schooner Ernestina-Morrissey

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-07-18JointHearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-07-10HouseHouse concurred
2019-06-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
2019-06-24SenateRules suspended
2019-06-17SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

S2112 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S449 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1398 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1940 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1683 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback