MA S2281 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2283
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-16 - Reprinted as amended, see S2283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-16 - Reprinted as amended, see S2283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote public safety and to protect access to reproductive health care facilities. The Judiciary.
Title
To promote public safety and protect access to reproductive health care facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2283 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Amendment (Chandler) adopted |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Read second |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2014 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2014-07-16 | House | House concurred |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on The Judiciary |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-14 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2283 (Replaces) 2014-07-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 197 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2281 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2281.pdf |