MA S227 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish the Massachusetts Information Privacy and Security Act. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Massachusetts Information Privacy and Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-11SenateSenate concurred
2024-04-08HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 6, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-01-29JointHearing scheduled for 02/02/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2023-11-06SenateSenate concurred
2023-11-02HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity
2023-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

S25 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S1075 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H2671 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback