MA S2267 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1862
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to school bus safety,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2267).
Title
Relative to school bus safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-05-02 | Senate | New draft of S1862 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1862 (Replaces) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2267
S2088 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2088
S1282 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H2161
S1778 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3153 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H3027 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H3043 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Transportation
S1721 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2088 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2088
S1282 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H2161
S1778 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3153 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H3027 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H3043 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Transportation
S1721 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2267 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2267.pdf |