MA S2265 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate the month of May as Blue Star Mothers month. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating the month of May as Blue Star Mothers Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-06-18 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrosed |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2012 from 10:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1 |
2012-05-17 | House | House concurred |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2265 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17420&generalCourtId=1 |