MA S2247 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to uniform financial aid information (Senate, No. 680),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft entitled "An Act requiring institutions of higher education to provide uniform financial aid information to accepted applicants" (Senate, No. 2247).
Title
Requiring institutions of higher education to provide uniform financial aid information to accepted applicants
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #318 [Yeas 39 to Nays 0] (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-22 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #318 [Yeas 39 to Nays 0] |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read third |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S680 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Lesser) adopted |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S680 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2247 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2247.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/190/SenateRollCall318.pdf |