MA S2236 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fair radius restrictions of transfer stations. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to fair radius restrictions of transfer stations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-06-15 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S622 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3325 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2368 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2056 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3293 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3325 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2368 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2056 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3293 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2236 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2236.pdf |