MA S2233 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Lowell to acquire easements over certain parcels of land. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management to grant to the city of Lowell easements over certain parcels of land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #279 [37 YEAS to 0 NAYS] |
2012-07-30 | House | Enacted - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 340) |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-07-30 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-07-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-07-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-23 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2012-07-11 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2012-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2012 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2012-04-23 | House | House concurred |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2233 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17969&generalCourtId=1 |