MA S2231 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2185
Note: Legislation replaced by S2273
Note: Legislation replaced by S2273
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - New draft substituted, see S2273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - New draft substituted, see S2273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Wenham to grant a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Wenham to grant a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2273 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Read third |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-04-23 | Senate | New draft of S2185 |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2185 (Replaces) 2012-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2231
S2273 (Replaced by) 2012-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2012
S2273 (Replaced by) 2012-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2231 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=117600&generalCourtId=1 |