MA S2228 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to mobile carrying devices. Transportation.
Title
Relative to mobile carrying devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H379 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H3439 (Similar To) 2023-12-21 - Accompanied S2209
H4253 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/19/2024 from 10:00 AM-06:00 PM in A-2
H3439 (Similar To) 2023-12-21 - Accompanied S2209
H4253 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/19/2024 from 10:00 AM-06:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2228 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2228.pdf |